It is currently Tue Jan 23, 2018 6:18 pm

 All times are UTC

 Page 1 of 2 [ 17 posts ] Go to page 1, 2  Next
 Print view Previous topic | Next topic
Author Message
 Post subject: interesting tips from bbcPosted: Wed Aug 22, 2007 2:59 pm

Joined: Mon Jun 18, 2007 2:32 pm
Posts: 7140
Location: East Kent
http://www.bbcbackpage.co.uk/player.html?h=770

just come across this, it's a primary school age site, with short videos of tips from parents etc with games and handy hints on how to get ideas across in english and maths. I found it very interesting

Top

 Post subject: Re: interesting tips from bbcPosted: Wed Sep 12, 2007 9:40 am

Joined: Fri Nov 17, 2006 8:54 pm
Posts: 1776
Location: caversham
yoyo123 wrote:
http://www.bbcbackpage.co.uk/player.html?h=770

just come across this, it's a primary school age site, with short videos of tips from parents etc with games and handy hints on how to get ideas across in english and maths. I found it very interesting

Just had a quick look, wanted a tip for year 3 who has mental block on dividing. Found a video using paper cups, so a big visual clue, will try tonight. Another link for my favourites. Thanks yoyo123.

stevew61

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Tue Oct 16, 2007 12:15 pm
Thanks, Yoyo123!

Have just checked out the bbc backpage site and there are some great tips on there.

My daughter already loves the 'nine times table finger rule' (For any who haven't come across it - Hold up hands with palms facing you. Number fingers 1-10 going from left to right. If you want to know e.g 3x9, fold down finger 3. Count the fingers on the left of folded finger to give tens i.e 2 in this case gives 20. Then count fingers on right of folded finger to give the units i.e seven. Add together making 27. Takes seconds to check once they've got it!)

I found a tip on that site for doing all the tables higher than six(yes, really!) and i'm looking forward to showing her when she gets home (Of course I won't claim I made it up myself!)
Hold both hands up with palms facing each other about 10cm apart. Number thumbs as 6 then continue to number each finger 7,8,9 until the little fingers are 10 (could write on with pen to start with).
So, if you want to know e.g 8x8, touch the two finger 8s together.
Now count the two finger 8s plus all the fingers in front of this (two 6s +two 7s) in total making six fingers giving you your tens figure of 60.
To get the units, look behind the finger 8s that are touching. Multiply the fingers left on one hand by the fingers left on the other, in this case 2x2=4.
Add 60 +4 =64. Try it, it's much simpler than it sounds!

Could quickly solve the moments when the word-perfect table of last week is temporarily absent.

Then again, I could be the only one who didn't know this, so apologies if that's the case! Little things.......

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Wed Oct 17, 2007 10:27 am
One Down.. wrote:
My daughter already loves the 'nine times table finger rule' (For any who haven't come across it - Hold up hands with palms facing you. Number fingers 1-10 going from left to right. If you want to know e.g 3x9, fold down finger 3. Count the fingers on the left of folded finger to give tens i.e 2 in this case gives 20. Then count fingers on right of folded finger to give the units i.e seven. Add together making 27. Takes seconds to check once they've got it!)

I learned this from Little Jimmy Osmond back in the 70s! (Not in person - he described it in a TV interview! ) I've now passed the technique onto my own kids. Thanks, Jim!

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Wed Oct 17, 2007 5:19 pm
Just shows there is nothing new in the world - maybe we should be asking grandparents for 11+ tips. It's quite amusing to think of Jimmy Osmond sitting doing that between shows, though!

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Thu May 29, 2008 9:16 am

Joined: Mon Mar 03, 2008 9:35 am
Posts: 83
Thought that this tip might be useful for nine times table:

When writing the 9x as below

1 x 9 = 09
2 x 9 = 18
3 x 9 = 27

My father taught me that
The tens column increases from 0, 1, 2, 3, and the units column decreases by 1 each time 9, 8, 7 etc..

You don't need to write the sum down to remember which number is in the tens column. This number is always one less than the number you are multiplying the 9 by (so for 6 x 9 the answer begins with a 5). Also, the units part of the answer added to the tens part always adds up to nine (so using 6 x 9 again 5 + 4 = 9 and 54 is the answer). This meant that from early junior school my 9x table was almost instantaneous with absolutely no work other than a simple addition.

I can remember teaching my daughter the same method when she was young - I've just asked her what 6 x 9 is and she gave me an instant answer (from the kitchen so she didn't know that I was writing about). It seems long-winded on paper, but is actually very simple and you don't need to use fingers to make it work.

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Thu May 29, 2008 12:12 pm

Joined: Fri Jul 06, 2007 8:31 pm
Posts: 1245
there's something spooky about the nine times table...

you add the digits of the result together and always get nine.

or even spookier...

12345679 (i.e 1 to 9 with 8 missed out)

x 9

= .... ?

Regards
SVE

_________________
Animis opibusque parati

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Thu May 29, 2008 12:54 pm

Joined: Mon Mar 03, 2008 9:35 am
Posts: 83
Wow, that was one I didn't know.

I did forget to add the bit about the answers in the 9x table each adding up to 9, that's how my father taught me to check the answer was right.

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Thu May 29, 2008 1:49 pm

Joined: Mon Jan 30, 2006 4:07 pm
Posts: 2669
Dear SunlampVexesEel

I love math oddities, an extension of yours....

12345679 X 9 = 111 111 111

12345679 X 18 = 222 222 222

12345679 X 27 = 333 333 333

12345679 x 36 = yes of course, its easy 444 444 444

and so and so on...

Patricia

Top

 Post subject: Posted: Wed Oct 15, 2008 9:19 pm

Joined: Mon Sep 29, 2008 5:48 pm
Posts: 3
Hi, I know it's not much to do with time tables for this age group, but I can share how to multiply 2 digit numbers ending in 5.

Lets take 25x25
you take the first digit(in this case 2) and multiply it by a number 1 bigger(in this case 3). You end up with 6 and you always write 25 in the end, so the answer is 625.

75x75 7x8=56 add 25 in the end and you have 5625

95x95 9x10=90 and 25 in the end is 9025

Top

 Display posts from previous: All posts1 day7 days2 weeks1 month3 months6 months1 year Sort by AuthorPost timeSubject AscendingDescending
 Page 1 of 2 [ 17 posts ] Go to page 1, 2  Next

 All times are UTC

#### Who is online

Users browsing this forum: No registered users and 1 guest

 You cannot post new topics in this forumYou cannot reply to topics in this forumYou cannot edit your posts in this forumYou cannot delete your posts in this forumYou cannot post attachments in this forum

Search for:
 Jump to:  Select a forum ------------------ FORUM RULES    Forum Rules and FAQs 11 PLUS SUBJECTS    VERBAL REASONING    MATHS    ENGLISH    NON-VERBAL REASONING    CEM 11 Plus GENERAL    GENERAL 11 PLUS TOPICS    11 PLUS APPEALS    11 PLUS TUTORS    INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS    11 PLUS CDs/SOFTWARE    11 PLUS TIPS    PRIMARY    SEN and the 11 PLUS    EVERYTHING ELSE .... 11 PLUS REGIONS    Berkshire    Bexley and Bromley    Birmingham, Walsall, Wolverhampton and Wrekin    Buckinghamshire    Devon    Dorset    Essex    Essex - Redbridge    Gloucestershire    Hertfordshire (South West)    Hertfordshire (Other and North London)    Kent    Lancashire & Cumbria    Lincolnshire    Medway    Northern Ireland    Surrey (Sutton, Kingston and Wandsworth)    Trafford    Warwickshire    Wiltshire    Wirral    Yorkshire BEYOND 11 PLUS    Beyond 11 Plus - General    GCSEs    6th Form    University